Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR13 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/16/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pickett H.J.R. No. 13


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue
 derived from the tax imposed on the sale and use of taxable items to
 the state highway fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a)  In each state fiscal year, the comptroller of
 public accounts shall deposit an amount equal to $3 billion of the
 total net revenue derived from the imposition of the state sales and
 use tax on the sale, storage, use, or other consumption in this
 state of taxable items under Chapter 151, Tax Code, or its
 successor, to the credit of the state highway fund.
 (b)  In addition to the deposit made under subsection (a),
 the comptroller shall deposit an amount equal to two percent of the
 net revenue derived from the imposition of the state sales and use
 tax under Chapter 151, Tax Code, minus the deposit required under
 subsection (a) to the credit of the state highway fund.
 (c)  Revenue deposited to the credit of the state highway
 fund under subsections (a) and (b) may be appropriated only to:
 (1)  construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for
 public roadways other than toll roads;
 (2)  to repay the principal of and interest on bonds and
 other public securities issued, and bond enhancement agreements
 entered into, as authorized by Section 49-n, Article III, Texas
 Constitution, as proposed by H.J.R. 28, 78th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2003; or,
 (3)  repay the principal and interest on general
 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
 of this constitution.
 (d)  This provision expires September 1, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION:  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular session, 2015, dedicating a portion of the state sales and
 use tax to the state highway fund.
 (b)  Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution
 takes effect September 1, 2017.
 (c)  Section 7-c(b), Article VIII, of this constitution
 takes effect September 1, 2016.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2016.
 This proposed constitutional amendment shall be submitted to
 the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.  The ballot
 shall be printed to permit voting for or against the proposition:
 "The constitutional amendment dedicating a portion of sales tax
 revenue towards increased transportation funding."