1 | 1 | | 84R23069 CJC-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Pickett, Otto, Harless, Parker, H.J.R. No. 13 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Davis of Dallas |
---|
4 | 4 | | Substitute the following for H.J.R. No. 13: |
---|
5 | 5 | | By: Phillips C.S.H.J.R. No. 13 |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | 9 | | proposing a constitutional amendment temporarily dedicating a |
---|
10 | 10 | | portion of the revenue derived from the state sales and use tax to |
---|
11 | 11 | | the state highway fund. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | adding Section 7-c to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 7-c. (a) In each state fiscal year, the comptroller of |
---|
16 | 16 | | public accounts shall deposit to the credit of the state highway |
---|
17 | 17 | | fund $3 billion of the net revenue derived from the imposition of |
---|
18 | 18 | | the state sales and use tax on the sale, storage, use, or other |
---|
19 | 19 | | consumption in this state of taxable items under Chapter 151, Tax |
---|
20 | 20 | | Code, or its successor. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) In addition to any deposit made under Subsection (a) of |
---|
22 | 22 | | this section, in each state fiscal year the comptroller of public |
---|
23 | 23 | | accounts shall deposit to the credit of the state highway fund an |
---|
24 | 24 | | amount equal to two percent of the net revenue described by that |
---|
25 | 25 | | subsection that is not deposited as provided by that subsection. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund |
---|
27 | 27 | | under this section may be appropriated only to: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (1) construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for |
---|
29 | 29 | | public roadways other than toll roads; or |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2) repay the principal of and interest on: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (A) bonds and other public securities issued, and |
---|
32 | 32 | | bond enhancement agreements entered into, as authorized by Section |
---|
33 | 33 | | 49-n, Article III, of this constitution, as proposed by H.J.R. 28, |
---|
34 | 34 | | 78th Legislature, Regular Session, 2003; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | (B) general obligation bonds issued as |
---|
36 | 36 | | authorized by Section 49-p, Article III, of this constitution. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2026. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
39 | 39 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
40 | 40 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
41 | 41 | | to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, |
---|
42 | 42 | | Regular Session, 2015, temporarily dedicating a portion of the |
---|
43 | 43 | | revenue derived from the state sales and use tax to the state |
---|
44 | 44 | | highway fund. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution |
---|
46 | 46 | | takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (c) Section 7-c(b), Article VIII, of this constitution |
---|
48 | 48 | | takes effect September 1, 2016. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (d) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2018. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
51 | 51 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015. |
---|
52 | 52 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
53 | 53 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment temporarily dedicating |
---|
54 | 54 | | a portion of state sales and use tax revenue to increase |
---|
55 | 55 | | transportation funding." |
---|