Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR13 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2015

                    84R23069 CJC-D
 By: Pickett, Otto, Harless, Parker, H.J.R. No. 13
 Davis of Dallas
 Substitute the following for H.J.R. No. 13:
 By:  Phillips C.S.H.J.R. No. 13


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment temporarily dedicating a
 portion of the revenue derived from the state sales and use tax to
 the state highway fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a) In each state fiscal year, the comptroller of
 public accounts shall deposit to the credit of the state highway
 fund $3 billion of the net revenue derived from the imposition of
 the state sales and use tax on the sale, storage, use, or other
 consumption in this state of taxable items under Chapter 151, Tax
 Code, or its successor.
 (b)  In addition to any deposit made under Subsection (a) of
 this section, in each state fiscal year the comptroller of public
 accounts shall deposit to the credit of the state highway fund an
 amount equal to two percent of the net revenue described by that
 subsection that is not deposited as provided by that subsection.
 (c)  Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund
 under this section may be appropriated only to:
 (1)  construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for
 public roadways other than toll roads; or
 (2)  repay the principal of and interest on:
 (A)  bonds and other public securities issued, and
 bond enhancement agreements entered into, as authorized by Section
 49-n, Article III, of this constitution, as proposed by H.J.R. 28,
 78th Legislature, Regular Session, 2003; and
 (B)  general obligation bonds issued as
 authorized by Section 49-p, Article III, of this constitution.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, temporarily dedicating a portion of the
 revenue derived from the state sales and use tax to the state
 highway fund.
 (b)  Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution
 takes effect September 1, 2017.
 (c)  Section 7-c(b), Article VIII, of this constitution
 takes effect September 1, 2016.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment temporarily dedicating
 a portion of state sales and use tax revenue to increase
 transportation funding."