Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR24 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R8753 TJB-F
 By: Harless H.J.R. No. 24


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating revenue derived
 from the taxes imposed on the sale, use, or rental of motor vehicles
 to the state highway fund and limiting the permissible uses of
 certain money in the fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  (a)  Subject to legislative appropriation,
 allocation and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
 from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing,
 maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and
 road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2,
 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment
 out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing
 law;] provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue
 from the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School
 Fund; and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by
 counties from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less
 than the maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and
 the percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws
 in effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
 purpose.
 (b)  For a biennium, the Legislature may not appropriate
 funds derived from the revenue described by Subsection (a) of this
 section or Section 7-b of this article for a purpose other than
 acquiring rights-of-way or planning, designing, constructing, or
 maintaining public roadways in an amount that exceeds the lesser
 of:
 (1)  the total amount of those funds appropriated for a
 purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way or planning, designing,
 constructing, or maintaining public roadways in the preceding
 biennium; or
 (2)  the amount determined under Subsection (c) of this
 section.
 (c)  For each biennium, the maximum amount that may be
 appropriated as provided by Subsection (b) of this section is
 reduced by 20 percent from the preceding biennium if the estimate of
 anticipated revenue from all sources made in advance of the regular
 session under Section 49a(a), Article III, of this constitution for
 the biennium exceeds the total amount of revenue from all sources
 for the preceding biennium by more than three times the amount of
 the reduction.
 (d)  All net revenue derived from the taxes imposed on the
 sale, use, or rental of motor vehicles by Chapter 152, Tax Code, or
 its successor shall be deposited to the credit of a special account
 in the state highway fund.
 (e)  Interest earned on the account under Subsection (d) of
 this section in the state highway fund shall be credited to the
 account. Revenue allocated to the account and interest on the
 revenue may be used only for acquiring rights-of-way and planning,
 designing, constructing, and maintaining nontolled public
 roadways.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, dedicating revenue derived from the taxes
 imposed on the sale, use, or rental of motor vehicles to the state
 highway fund and limiting the permissible uses of certain money in
 the fund.
 (b)  Sections 7-a(b) and (c), Article VIII, of this
 constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal biennium
 that begins on or after September 1, 2017.
 (c)  Sections 7-a(d) and (e), Article VIII, of this
 constitution take effect January 1, 2016.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires September 2, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating revenue
 derived from the taxes imposed on the sale, use, or rental of motor
 vehicles to the state highway fund and limiting the permissible
 uses of certain money in the fund."