House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3468 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1089 | Journal Page: 3467 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Failed of adoption | Journal Page: 3467 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 3-Howard | Journal Page: 3467 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment fails of adoption | 2-J. Rodriguez, Gonzlez, Guillen, and Collier | Journal Page: 3466 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 3465 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3465 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 3:55 PM | Journal Page: 3460 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3452 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |