1 | 1 | | 84R2497 TJB-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Harless H.J.R. No. 48 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | 6 | | proposing a constitutional amendment limiting the permissible uses |
---|
7 | 7 | | of the state highway fund, including further limiting the use of |
---|
8 | 8 | | additional tax and fee revenue attributable to changes to certain |
---|
9 | 9 | | state taxes and fees, to increase revenue for nontolled public |
---|
10 | 10 | | highway purposes. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, |
---|
13 | 13 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 7-a. (a) Except as provided by Subsections (d) and (e) |
---|
15 | 15 | | of this section and subject [Subject] to legislative appropriation, |
---|
16 | 16 | | allocation and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment |
---|
17 | 17 | | of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived |
---|
18 | 18 | | from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross |
---|
19 | 19 | | production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used |
---|
20 | 20 | | to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the |
---|
21 | 21 | | sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing, |
---|
22 | 22 | | maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the |
---|
23 | 23 | | administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature |
---|
24 | 24 | | pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads; |
---|
25 | 25 | | [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and |
---|
26 | 26 | | road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, |
---|
27 | 27 | | 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment |
---|
28 | 28 | | out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing |
---|
29 | 29 | | law;] provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue |
---|
30 | 30 | | from the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School |
---|
31 | 31 | | Fund; and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by |
---|
32 | 32 | | counties from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less |
---|
33 | 33 | | than the maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and |
---|
34 | 34 | | the percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws |
---|
35 | 35 | | in effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be |
---|
36 | 36 | | construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any |
---|
37 | 37 | | purpose. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (b) For a biennium, the Legislature may not appropriate |
---|
39 | 39 | | funds derived from the revenue described by Subsection (a) of this |
---|
40 | 40 | | section or Section 7-b of this article for a purpose other than |
---|
41 | 41 | | acquiring rights-of-way or planning, designing, constructing, or |
---|
42 | 42 | | maintaining public roadways in an amount that exceeds the lesser |
---|
43 | 43 | | of: |
---|
44 | 44 | | (1) the total amount of those funds appropriated for a |
---|
45 | 45 | | purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way or planning, designing, |
---|
46 | 46 | | constructing, or maintaining public roadways in the preceding |
---|
47 | 47 | | biennium; or |
---|
48 | 48 | | (2) the amount determined under Subsection (c) of this |
---|
49 | 49 | | section. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (c) For each biennium, the maximum amount that may be |
---|
51 | 51 | | appropriated as provided by Subsection (b) of this section is |
---|
52 | 52 | | reduced by 20 percent from the preceding biennium if the estimate of |
---|
53 | 53 | | anticipated revenue from all sources made in advance of the regular |
---|
54 | 54 | | session under Section 49a(a), Article III, of this constitution for |
---|
55 | 55 | | the biennium exceeds the total amount of revenue from all sources |
---|
56 | 56 | | for the preceding biennium by more than three times the amount of |
---|
57 | 57 | | the reduction. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (d) All net revenue deposited to the credit of the state |
---|
59 | 59 | | highway fund, as required by this section or by general law, that is |
---|
60 | 60 | | attributable to all or part of the following sources shall be |
---|
61 | 61 | | deposited to the credit of a special account in that fund: |
---|
62 | 62 | | (1) the state sales and use tax imposed on motor |
---|
63 | 63 | | vehicles by Chapter 152, Tax Code, or its successor; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (2) the taxes imposed on gasoline and diesel fuel used |
---|
65 | 65 | | to propel motor vehicles on the public roadways attributable to the |
---|
66 | 66 | | portion of the tax rates in excess of 20 cents for each net gallon or |
---|
67 | 67 | | fractional part on which the gasoline or diesel fuel tax is imposed; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (3) registration fees imposed on motorcycles and |
---|
69 | 69 | | mopeds by Section 502.251, Transportation Code, or its successor, |
---|
70 | 70 | | attributable to the portion of the rate of those fees that exceeds |
---|
71 | 71 | | the rate in effect on August 31, 2015; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (4) registration fees imposed on vehicles that weigh |
---|
73 | 73 | | 6,000 pounds or less by Section 502.252, Transportation Code, or |
---|
74 | 74 | | its successor, and other vehicles to which that section applies, |
---|
75 | 75 | | attributable to the portion of the rate of those fees that exceeds |
---|
76 | 76 | | the rate in effect on August 31, 2015; |
---|
77 | 77 | | (5) registration fees imposed on vehicles that weigh |
---|
78 | 78 | | more than 6,000 pounds by Section 502.253, Transportation Code, or |
---|
79 | 79 | | its successor, and other vehicles to which that section applies, |
---|
80 | 80 | | attributable to the portion of the rates of those fees that exceed |
---|
81 | 81 | | the rates in effect on August 31, 2015; |
---|
82 | 82 | | (6) registration fees imposed on trailers, travel |
---|
83 | 83 | | trailers, and semitrailers by Section 502.254, Transportation |
---|
84 | 84 | | Code, or its successor, attributable to the portion of the rate of |
---|
85 | 85 | | those fees that exceeds the rate in effect on August 31, 2015; and |
---|
86 | 86 | | (7) the revenue from any other tax, fee, or charge not |
---|
87 | 87 | | previously dedicated to the state highway fund that is dedicated to |
---|
88 | 88 | | that fund by an act of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015. |
---|
89 | 89 | | (e) Interest earned on the account under Subsection (d) of |
---|
90 | 90 | | this section in the state highway fund shall be credited to the |
---|
91 | 91 | | account. Revenue allocated to the account and interest on the |
---|
92 | 92 | | revenue may be used only for acquiring rights-of-way and planning, |
---|
93 | 93 | | designing, constructing, and maintaining nontolled public |
---|
94 | 94 | | roadways. |
---|
95 | 95 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
96 | 96 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
97 | 97 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
98 | 98 | | to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, |
---|
99 | 99 | | Regular Session, 2015, to limit the permissible uses of the state |
---|
100 | 100 | | highway fund, including further limiting the use of additional tax |
---|
101 | 101 | | and fee revenue attributable to changes to certain state taxes and |
---|
102 | 102 | | fees, to increase revenue for nontolled public highway purposes. |
---|
103 | 103 | | (b) Sections 7-a(b) and (c), Article VIII, of this |
---|
104 | 104 | | constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal biennium |
---|
105 | 105 | | that begins on or after September 1, 2017. |
---|
106 | 106 | | (c) Sections 7-a(d) and (e), Article VIII, of this |
---|
107 | 107 | | constitution take effect January 1, 2016. |
---|
108 | 108 | | (d) This temporary provision expires September 2, 2017. |
---|
109 | 109 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
110 | 110 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015. |
---|
111 | 111 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
112 | 112 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment limiting the |
---|
113 | 113 | | permissible uses of the state highway fund, including further |
---|
114 | 114 | | limiting the use of additional tax and fee revenue attributable to |
---|
115 | 115 | | changes to certain state taxes and fees, to increase revenue for |
---|
116 | 116 | | nontolled public highway purposes." |
---|