Senate | 05/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1131 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1981 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#391 | Journal Page: 1980 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1980 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1980 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 01/05/2015 | Filed |