Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2919 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#825 | Journal Page: 2918 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2918 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2918 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 467 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 467 | |
House | 02/03/2015 | Filed |