Senate | 05/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1944 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 698 | |
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1435 | |
House | 04/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#168 | Journal Page: 1380 |
House | 04/07/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1380 | |
House | 04/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1380 | |
House | 04/07/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 465 | |
House | 01/15/2015 | Filed |