House | 03/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1049 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1049 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 945 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |