House | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3977 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#1263 | Journal Page: 3977 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3977 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3977 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2810 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 898 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |