Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR124 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 124


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life filled with notable accomplishments drew to a
 close with the passing of the Honorable Mark Silverstone of
 Georgetown on November 9, 2014, at the age of 65; and
 WHEREAS, Mark Jerome Silverstone was born in Brownsville on
 May 30, 1949, to Mark and Helen Silverstone; after graduating with
 both a bachelor of business administration degree and a juris
 doctor degree from The University of Texas at Austin, he led a
 distinguished 33-year career as an attorney and managing partner
 with the law firm of Sneed, Vine & Perry, P.C.; and
 WHEREAS, On January 8, 2007, he was appointed by Governor
 Rick Perry as the first judge of the 425th District Court in
 Williamson County, and he was elected to that office by area voters
 the following year; throughout his tenure, he exemplified the
 highest standards of public service, and he was instrumental in the
 founding of the county's Court Appointed Special Advocates (CASA)
 program in 2009; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to his many professional duties, Judge
 Silverstone was an active community leader and gave generously of
 his time and talents as a member of the board of the Georgetown
 Chamber of Commerce and as a member of the local Rotary Club; and
 WHEREAS, Judge Mark Silverstone made a positive difference in
 the lives of his loved ones and fellow citizens alike, and although
 he will be deeply missed, he leaves behind a legacy of meaningful
 service that will long inspire all those who had the good fortune to
 know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of the Honorable Mark
 Silverstone and extend sincere condolences to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Georganna Silverstone; to his stepsons, Travis
 Perthuis and his wife, Brittany, and Brett Perthuis; to his
 brother, Elliot Silverstone, and his wife, Diane; and to his other
 relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Judge Mark
 Silverstone.
 Dale
 Gonzales
 Farney
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 124 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on February 19, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House