House | 04/15/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1467 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1467 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1359 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Filed |