Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1408 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/21/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1408


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of Wilford F. Pickard Jr. of College
 Station on March 9, 2015, at the age of 81, has brought a great loss
 to the Texas A&M University community; and
 WHEREAS, Born in San Antonio on October 31, 1933, to Wilford
 Pickard and Katherine Bossy, "Billy" Pickard graduated from Central
 Catholic High School and subsequently enrolled at A&M; he joined
 the Aggie football program as a student trainer, and he worked in
 that capacity under legendary coach Paul "Bear" Bryant until he
 completed his bachelor's degree in physical education in 1956; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Pickard began his professional career as the
 head athletic trainer at Port Arthur and Brazosport High Schools
 before returning to College Station in 1965 to take over as head
 athletic trainer for the football team; over the ensuing five
 decades, he took on an ever-increasing number of responsibilities
 within the A&M athletic department, serving as the school's
 equipment manager, assistant athletic director for training,
 equipment, and facilities, and associate athletic director for
 facilities; he was named senior associate athletic director for
 facilities in 1994, and in this role he helped coordinate the
 construction of the Bright Football Complex, Nye Academic Center,
 and the Bernard C. Richardson Zone at Kyle Field; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed Texan officially retired in 2009, but
 he continued to be a familiar and welcome presence on the A&M
 campus; affectionately known as the "Keeper of Kyle Field," he
 would often arrive at 6 a.m. to check on the stadium, and he was a
 fixture and frequent speaker at Aggie football practices in recent
 seasons; Mr. Pickard also lent his support to the school's other
 athletic programs, attending myriad baseball and basketball games;
 and
 WHEREAS, Highly respected by players and peers alike,
 Mr. Pickard held a number of important leadership positions within
 the Southwest Athletic Trainers' Association, and the organization
 honored him for his many contributions with the prestigious Frank
 Medina Award in 1984; he was inducted into the National Athletic
 Trainers' Association Hall of Fame in 1985, and he was a member of
 the Texas A&M Lettermen's Association Hall of Honor; moreover, he
 received well-deserved recognition for his dedicated efforts in
 behalf of the university when the school declared October 10, 2009,
 as Billy Pickard Day at Kyle Field; and
 WHEREAS, In all of his endeavors, Mr. Pickard enjoyed the
 love and support of his wife, Linda, and their six children, Kevin,
 Joe, Janet, John, Jean, and Joy, and he later knew the joy of
 welcoming two additional generations into his cherished family; and
 WHEREAS, Billy Pickard made a positive difference in
 countless lives during his exemplary service to Texas A&M
 University, and he will forever hold a special place in the hearts
 of his loved ones and Aggies everywhere; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Billy Pickard and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his wife
 of 43 years, Linda Pickard; to his children, Kevin Pickard and his
 wife, Amy, Joe Pickard and his wife, Jan, Janet Bausch, John Pickard
 and his wife, Diane, Jean Carter and her husband, Jeff, and Joy
 Crowl and her husband, Mark; to his grandchildren and his
 great-granddaughter; to his brother, Robert Pickard, and his wife,
 Mary; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Billy
 Pickard.
 Kacal
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1408 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 16, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House