Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1574 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/26/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1574


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The family and friends of Vernon C. Broadus Jr. of
 Dallas were greatly saddened by his passing on March 17, 2015, at
 the age of 64; and
 WHEREAS, Born on August 12, 1950, to Vernon and Emmer Lou
 Broadus, Vernon Broadus Jr. was educated in Dallas public schools,
 and he later studied at Southern Methodist University; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Broadus married the former Diana Hamilton on
 August 16, 1969, and the couple shared more than four and a half
 decades together; the devoted father of four children, Regina,
 V. C., Reginald, and Akil, Mr. Broadus later knew the joy of
 welcoming into his family six grandchildren, Ian, Alique, Alivia,
 Reginald, Ava, and Akilah; and
 WHEREAS, Engaged in his community, Mr. Broadus served as
 president of the PTA at Erasmo Seguin Community Learning Center as
 well as a volunteer for the Martin Luther King Jr. Community Center,
 the United Negro College Fund, and KERA/Channel 13; moreover, he
 was active in the United States Senate campaign for former Dallas
 mayor Ron Kirk; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Broadus was a valued and longtime congregant of
 Light of the World Church of Christ in Dallas, where he sang with
 the Adult Chorus; he further shared his musical talents as a member
 of the Acapella Alliance Chorus, the Mountain View Mass Choir, and
 the A. Hugh Graham Singers; and
 WHEREAS, In his leisure time, Mr. Broadus enjoyed reading,
 watching movies, and spending time with his loved ones, especially
 his grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Vernon Broadus lived a rich and purposeful life
 centered around his faith, his family, and his community, and he
 will be remembered with admiration and affection by all who knew
 him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Vernon C. Broadus
 Jr. and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Diana Broadus; to his children, Regina Gail, V. C. Broadus
 III, and Akil Mensah; to his grandchildren, Ian Compton, Alique and
 Ava Broadus, Reginald Compton, and Akilah Frazier; to his brother,
 Freddie Porter; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Vernon
 Broadus.
 Davis of Dallas
 Straus González Paddie Straus González Paddie
Straus González Paddie
 Allen Guerra Parker Allen Guerra Parker
Allen Guerra Parker
 Alonzo Guillen Paul Alonzo Guillen Paul
Alonzo Guillen Paul
 Alvarado Gutierrez Peña Alvarado Gutierrez Peña
Alvarado Gutierrez Peña
 Anchia Harless Phelan Anchia Harless Phelan
Anchia Harless Phelan
 Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips
Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips
 Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett
Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett
 Ashby Howard Price Ashby Howard Price
Ashby Howard Price
 Aycock Huberty Raney Aycock Huberty Raney
Aycock Huberty Raney
 Bell Hughes Raymond Bell Hughes Raymond
Bell Hughes Raymond
 Bernal Hunter Reynolds Bernal Hunter Reynolds
Bernal Hunter Reynolds
 Blanco Isaac Riddle Blanco Isaac Riddle
Blanco Isaac Riddle
 Bohac Israel Rinaldi Bohac Israel Rinaldi
Bohac Israel Rinaldi
 Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar
Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar
 Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis
Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis
 Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr. Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr.
Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr.
 Burns Keough Rose Burns Keough Rose
Burns Keough Rose
 Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford
Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford
 Button King of Parker Schaefer Button King of Parker Schaefer
Button King of Parker Schaefer
 Canales King of Taylor Schofield Canales King of Taylor Schofield
Canales King of Taylor Schofield
 Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert
Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert
 Clardy Klick Shaheen Clardy Klick Shaheen
Clardy Klick Shaheen
 Coleman Koop Sheets Coleman Koop Sheets
Coleman Koop Sheets
 Collier Krause Sheffield Collier Krause Sheffield
Collier Krause Sheffield
 Cook Kuempel Simmons Cook Kuempel Simmons
Cook Kuempel Simmons
 Craddick Landgraf Simpson Craddick Landgraf Simpson
Craddick Landgraf Simpson
 Crownover Larson Smith Crownover Larson Smith
Crownover Larson Smith
 Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee
Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee
 Dale Leach Spitzer Dale Leach Spitzer
Dale Leach Spitzer
 Darby Longoria Springer Darby Longoria Springer
Darby Longoria Springer
 Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson
Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson
 Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland
Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland
 Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria
Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria
 Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris
Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris
 Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt
Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt
 Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin
Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin
 Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris
Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris
 Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant
Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant
 Farias Miles VanDeaver Farias Miles VanDeaver
Farias Miles VanDeaver
 Farney Miller of Comal Villalba Farney Miller of Comal Villalba
Farney Miller of Comal Villalba
 Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo
Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo
 Fletcher Moody Walle Fletcher Moody Walle
Fletcher Moody Walle
 Flynn Morrison White of Bell Flynn Morrison White of Bell
Flynn Morrison White of Bell
 Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler
Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler
 Frullo Murphy Workman Frullo Murphy Workman
Frullo Murphy Workman
 Galindo Murr Wray Galindo Murr Wray
Galindo Murr Wray
 Geren Naishtat Wu Geren Naishtat Wu
Geren Naishtat Wu
 Giddings Nevárez Zedler Giddings Nevárez Zedler
Giddings Nevárez Zedler
 Goldman Oliveira Zerwas Goldman Oliveira Zerwas
Goldman Oliveira Zerwas
 Gonzales Otto Gonzales Otto
Gonzales Otto
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1574 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on March 26, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Straus González Paddie

Allen Guerra Parker

Alonzo Guillen Paul

Alvarado Gutierrez Peña

Anchia Harless Phelan

Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips

Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett

Ashby Howard Price

Aycock Huberty Raney

Bell Hughes Raymond

Bernal Hunter Reynolds

Blanco Isaac Riddle

Bohac Israel Rinaldi

Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar

Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis

Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr.

Burns Keough Rose

Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford

Button King of Parker Schaefer

Canales King of Taylor Schofield

Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert

Clardy Klick Shaheen

Coleman Koop Sheets

Collier Krause Sheffield

Cook Kuempel Simmons

Craddick Landgraf Simpson

Crownover Larson Smith

Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee

Dale Leach Spitzer

Darby Longoria Springer

Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson

Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland

Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria

Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris

Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt

Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin

Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris

Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant

Farias Miles VanDeaver

Farney Miller of Comal Villalba

Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo

Fletcher Moody Walle

Flynn Morrison White of Bell

Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler

Frullo Murphy Workman

Galindo Murr Wray

Geren Naishtat Wu

Giddings Nevárez Zedler

Goldman Oliveira Zerwas

Gonzales Otto