H.R. No. 1604 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, The Most Reverend William Michael Mulvey is celebrating his fifth anniversary as bishop of the Diocese of Corpus Christi on March 25, 2015; and WHEREAS, Born in Houston on August 23, 1949, to Daniel and Marjorie Mulvey, Michael Mulvey graduated from St. Edward's Catholic High School in Austin in 1967; he earned a bachelor's degree in business administration from St. Edward's University before pursuing his seminary education at North American College in Rome; he also received a bachelor's degree in sacred theology from the Pontifical University of St. Thomas Aquinas and a licentiate degree from Gregorian University; and WHEREAS, This esteemed clergyman was ordained in June 1975 by Pope Paul VI in St. Peter's Square at the Vatican, and he would go on to distinguish himself in a wide range of assignments for the Diocese of Austin over the course of more than three decades; following initial postings as an associate pastor for St. Mary of the Assumption and Our Lady of Guadalupe Parishes in Taylor and for St. Louis Parish in Austin, and then a year on sabbatical studying with the Focolare Movement, he spent five years as a chaplain to Reicher Catholic High School in Waco, where he also served as pastor of St. Joseph Parish; he then served as director of spiritual formation at St. Mary's Seminary in Houston for six years, until becoming pastor of St. Thomas Aquinas Parish in College Station in 1992; after three years in that role, he served as associate director and director of the Center for Spirituality for Diocesan Priests of the Focolare Movement in Florence, Italy, and Hyde Park, New York, respectively; and WHEREAS, In 1999, Bishop Mulvey returned to the Lone Star State to become pastor of St. Helen Parish in Georgetown; between 2004 and 2010, he served successively as chancellor, vicar general, and administrator of the Diocese of Austin, with a brief interlude as vice rector for St. Mary's Seminary in 2009; and WHEREAS, Bishop Mulvey was appointed to his current position on January 18, 2010, by Pope Benedict XVI, and he was consecrated as the eighth bishop of the Diocese of Corpus Christi on March 25, 2010; and WHEREAS, Throughout his career in the priesthood, Bishop Mulvey has carried out his ministry in a spirit of joyful service to others, and it is a privilege to join in recognizing this special milestone in his episcopacy; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas Legislature hereby honor Bishop William Michael Mulvey on the occasion of the fifth anniversary of his episcopal ordination and extend to him sincere best wishes as he continues his important work; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for Bishop Mulvey as an expression of high regard by the Texas House of Representatives. Herrero ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1604 was adopted by the House on April 16, 2015, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House