House | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3978 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#1264 | Journal Page: 3978 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3978 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3978 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1489 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Filed |