Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1707 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1707


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Robert L. Lasater of Stephenville on March 16, 2015, at
 the age of 92; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Harry and Della Lasater, "Tie" Lasater
 was born in Fannin County on June 29, 1922, and he grew up in Idalou;
 he married the former Billie Fugate on June 6, 1942, and they became
 the parents of a son, Russ, and daughter, Jo; following the death of
 his wife in 1991, he married his sister-in-law, the former Jessie
 Fugate, who passed away in 2005; and
 WHEREAS, This patriotic Texan served his country during World
 War II as a crew chief in the United States Army Air Corps, and in
 2012, he was selected by the South Plains Inaugural Honor Flight
 Program to join other veterans in laying wreaths at war memorials in
 Washington, D.C.; following his military service, Mr. Lasater was
 employed by Anthony Mechanical in Lubbock; as a superintendent for
 the company, he specialized in the mechanical construction of
 industrial heating and cooling systems for Texas Tech University,
 Methodist-Covenant Hospital, military bases, and other large
 clients; and
 WHEREAS, Respected in his community, Mr. Lasater was active
 in Asbury United Methodist Church for many years, and he served as
 chair of the board and of numerous committees; he also guided the
 church's construction and expansion, and he contributed to the
 congregation's Shalom Ministry as a board member and volunteer;
 later, he attended St. Luke's Methodist Church; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Lasater was an avid traveler, and he visited 48
 states, most of the Canadian provinces, and many European
 countries; in 2012, he moved to Stephenville to live on the small
 family farm owned by his son and daughter-in-law, and he spent his
 last year raising four Angus heifers, which all produced fine
 calves; and
 WHEREAS, Although Tie Lasater will be deeply missed, those he
 leaves behind will forever cherish their memories of this kind and
 caring man; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Robert L. "Tie"
 Lasater and extend sincere condolences to his loved ones: to
 his son, Russ Lasater, and his wife, Donna; to his daughter, Jo
 Lasater; to his grandchildren, Tie and his wife, Karah, Boone,
 Sage, and Senna; to his great-grandchildren, Keagan and Londyn
 Lasater; and to his many other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the members of his family and that when the Texas House
 of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Tie
 Lasater.
 Sheffield
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1707 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 23, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House