Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1773 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1773


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of Walter "Yukon" Yates of Cedar Park on
 March 2, 2015, at the age of 90, provides a fitting occasion to
 reflect on the extraordinary life of a remarkable man; and
 WHEREAS, Born on October 19, 1924, to Andrew Jesse and Mae
 Elizabeth Yates, Walter Yates was one of eight children in his
 family; he grew up in the Ozarks, on what is now known as Yates
 Mountain in northwest Arkansas, where he learned to hunt and fish as
 a boy; inspired by author Jack London, he developed a true passion
 for adventure and exploration at a young age, and he actively
 pursued a "master's in life" for the rest of his days; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Yates joined the United States Marine Corps on
 November 29, 1941; he completed his training on the island of Samoa
 in the South Pacific, and had his 18th birthday on the island of
 Guadalcanal; not long after, he was severely wounded by a mortar
 shell, and he was discharged as fully disabled in June 1945,
 although he refused to ever let his disability get in his way; and
 WHEREAS, After acquiring an interest in real estate,
 Mr. Yates began his career as a land developer; he considered his
 proudest professional achievement to be Breakaway Park, a fly-in
 community in Cedar Park where he lived for a number of years and
 where many aviation enthusiasts still reside; and
 WHEREAS, An accomplished pilot himself, Mr. Yates was
 perhaps best known for his quests in Alaska and the Yukon Territory
 of Canada; he spent a year exploring ghost towns and abandoned gold
 mines, achieving access to remote areas with his helicopter; in
 1975, he filmed a documentary called Breakaway, which captures his
 experiences living off the land in a log cabin he built in the
 Alaskan wilderness; when a malfunction caused his helicopter to
 crash in an isolated part of British Columbia in 1978, he survived
 alone for two weeks with a broken back before being rescued; and
 WHEREAS, Eventually, Mr. Yates set about writing a memoir to
 chronicle his expeditions in the far north as well as his years in
 Arkansas and Texas; the book Breakaway was published in 2011, and a
 second volume, Return to Post River The Last True Frontier, is
 forthcoming; a man of many talents, he used his spare time to build
 two helicopters and a two-seater airplane, and he also enjoyed
 restoring old cars; and
 WHEREAS, Although Walter Yates is deeply missed, memories of
 his enthusiasm for life and adventure remain to inspire those he
 leaves behind, and he will forever hold a special place in the
 hearts of all those who were fortunate enough to know him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Walter "Yukon"
 Yates and extend heartfelt sympathy to the members of his family: to
 his wife of 37 years, Tracy Yates; to his first wife and the mother
 of his children, Edith Williams; to his children, Sharolyn Yates,
 Susan McLaughlin and her husband, Bob, and Jay Yates and his
 fiancée, Nancy Grob; to his stepson, Greg Malone, and his wife,
 Lisa; to his brother, Donald Yates, and his wife, Lois; to his
 sister, Georgeanne Jones; to his 19 grandchildren and
 great-grandchildren; and to his other relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Walter
 Yates.
 Dale
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1773 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 7, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House