House | 05/08/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2805 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2805 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2255 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Filed |