Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1924 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1924


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The life and sacrifice of U.S. Navy Lieutenant Wilma
 Ledbetter, who died in the line of duty during the Korean War, were
 honored at a ceremony at First United Methodist Church in
 Chillicothe on March 14, 2015; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Chillicothe on April 27, 1912, Wilma
 Ledbetter attended Texas State College for Women and Central State
 Teachers College in Edmond, Oklahoma, before changing her career
 goal from teaching to nursing; she subsequently trained at the
 Northwest Texas Hospital School of Nursing in Amarillo from 1936 to
 1939; after working for a year as a nurse at the hospital, she
 joined the staff at Charity Hospital in New Orleans, and during the
 next two years she also continued her education at Louisiana State
 University; she returned to Texas in 1942 and worked at
 Brackenridge Hospital in Austin; and
 WHEREAS, Answering her nation's call to duty during World War
 II, Wilma Ledbetter joined the Navy Nurse Corps in July 1943, and
 she served at naval hospitals in San Diego, Hawaii, and New Orleans
 before being released from active duty in May 1946; the following
 year, she returned to duty as a member of the Navy Reserve Nurse
 Corps and was posted to Houston and then Nevada; in 1948, she was
 commissioned a lieutenant in the Nurse Corps; she worked for a time
 in Philadelphia, and when the Korean War broke out, she rejoined the
 active Navy Nurse Corps; and
 WHEREAS, On August 25, 1950, Lieutenant Ledbetter was serving
 on the USS Benevolence, a naval hospital ship, when it was
 accidentally rammed by a freighter in San Francisco Bay; the
 Benevolence keeled over on its side and sank within 45 minutes;
 plunged into the cold water of the bay, Lieutenant Ledbetter tried
 to help her fellow crew members; she was the last nurse to be pulled
 from the water, and the prolonged exposure tragically proved too
 great; she succumbed to hypothermia, becoming one of 23 people from
 the Benevolence to lose their lives; and
 WHEREAS, Sixty-five years later, Lieutenant Ledbetter's
 naval service was recognized in a solemn ceremony in her hometown,
 sponsored by the Western Trail and Austin Colony Chapters of the
 National Society of the Daughters of the American Revolution;
 Lieutenant Ledbetter's sister, Emily Ledbetter Shoemaker, and
 other members of her family were presented with the lieutenant's
 posthumous decorations, including the World War II Victory Medal,
 the American Campaign Medal, the Asiatic Pacific Medal, and the
 Gold Star Pin; and
 WHEREAS, Lieutenant Wilma Ledbetter dedicated her life to the
 care of this nation's military personnel, and she kept faith with
 that commitment until her very last moments; for her selfless
 efforts and immeasurable sacrifice, Americans owe this outstanding
 officer a debt that the passage of time can never diminish; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life and service of U.S. Navy
 Lieutenant Wilma Ledbetter.
 Springer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1924 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 7, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House