Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2142 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/07/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2142


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Countless lives were touched by the faith and
 leadership of Elder Cecil Ray Proctor of DeSoto, who passed away on
 April 10, 2015, at the age of 69; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Herman and Esther Alexander Proctor,
 Elder Proctor was born on August 11, 1945, in Marquez and was
 educated in the Frost school district; he married the love of his
 life, the former Mollie Sharper, on April 25, 1970, and they became
 the parents of five treasured children, Dawn, Yolanda, LaKitsha,
 Rachel, and Gilbert; and
 WHEREAS, In 1978, Cecil Proctor felt called to the ministry
 and began hosting a small Bible study group in his home; he became a
 licensed minister in the Church of God in Christ in 1987 and an
 ordained elder in 1989; shortly afterward, he organized the
 Neighborhood House of Prayer in Dallas, a church he guided with
 selfless devotion for close to four decades; and
 WHEREAS, Seeking additional ways to serve the community,
 Elder Proctor established the Neighborhood Christian Learning
 Center of Dallas, a licensed early childhood facility that partners
 with the Dallas Independent School District pre-K school readiness
 initiative; known to youngsters at NCLC of Dallas as "PaPa," Elder
 Proctor led the center as its administrator until his health
 declined, and he saw it recognized by the Texas Education Agency as
 a Pre-K Center of Excellence; to date, the center has provided
 services to more than 2,500 children in Dallas County; Elder
 Proctor was also responsible for founding the Neighborhood Outreach
 Center of Hope, a 24-hour, faith-based rehabilitation facility and
 shelter for former inmates and individuals recovering from
 substance abuse; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed clergyman also rendered outstanding
 service to the Texas East Ecclesiastical Jurisdiction of the Church
 of God in Christ; in 1984, he became the first adjutant to Bishop
 James Edward Lee Sr., and he served additionally as assistant to
 Superintendent Robert L. Nichols Sr. in the Spiritual Life
 District; and
 WHEREAS, Elder Proctor endeared himself to those in and
 outside his congregation with his sunny demeanor and contagious
 smile; he reached a wide audience in the Dallas/Fort Worth area
 through his weekly "Prayer of Faith" radio broadcast, and he often
 gathered with other pastors, politicians, and local leaders to
 enjoy a meal and discuss how they could make their community
 stronger; in 2006, he was honored for his myriad good works with his
 induction into the Elite News Religious Hall of Fame; and
 WHEREAS, With his kind and caring ways, Elder Cecil Ray
 Proctor uplifted the hearts of numerous people, and he will long be
 remembered with deep affection by his loved ones and by the dear
 friends he made along life's journey; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Elder Cecil Ray
 Proctor and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to
 his wife, Mollie M. Proctor; to his daughters, Dawn Washington,
 Yolanda Coleman and her husband, Anthony, LaKitsha Lee and her
 husband, James, and Rachel Proctor; to his grandchildren, Keithan
 Proctor, Jacniqua Washington, Christopher Washington, Shaquira
 Walker, Jaya Lee, and James Lee III; to his great-grandchildren,
 Niriyah Gahagan and Khrist'jan Walker; to his siblings, Christine
 Cotton, Vernel Smith, Eloise Fields, and Johnny Proctor; to his
 special son, the Reverend Mark Proctor, and his wife, Michelle; and
 to his many other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Elder Cecil
 Ray Proctor.
 Giddings
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2142 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 6, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House