Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2543 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2543


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life well lived may help to comfort
 those saddened by the passing of Jimmie Eugene Garrett Jr. of Corpus
 Christi on April 20, 2015, at the age of 59; and
 WHEREAS, Born on January 23, 1956, to Jimmie and Margaret
 Garrett, Mr. Garrett grew up in Corpus Christi and graduated from
 King High School in 1974; he married the love of his life, the
 former Christy O'Rourke, on September 2, 1978, and they became the
 proud parents of eight daughters, Kerre, Kristin, Kandace, Kortney,
 Korri, Katlyn, Kasey, and Kameryn; the couple later shared in the
 joy of welcoming into their cherished family seven grandchildren,
 Madison, Nathan, Jayden, Brooklyn, Jillian, Dylan, and Austin; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Garrett was employed as a mechanic for several
 years before taking over as the owner of Panjo's Pizza Parlor; he
 successfully operated the restaurant for a quarter-century, and he
 continued to manage the business until his final days; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed Texan was an ardent car enthusiast,
 and he often delighted in attending and participating in drag
 racing events; most of all, he loved sharing laughter and stories
 with family and friends; and
 WHEREAS, Kind and generous, Jimmie Garrett lived a life that
 was rich in the intangibles that matter most, and he is deeply
 missed by all those who had the good fortune to know him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Jimmie Eugene
 Garrett Jr. and extend sincere condolences to the members of his
 family: to his wife of 36 years, Christy O'Rourke Garrett; to his
 daughters, Kristin Marry and her husband, Djuan, Kandace Chapman
 and her husband, Cliff, Kortney Arispe and her husband, Nicholas,
 Korri Mesmer and her husband, David, and Katlyn, Kasey, and Kameryn
 Garrett; to his grandchildren, Madison White, Nathan, Jayden,
 Brooklyn, and Jillian Marry, and Dylan and Austin Arispe; to his
 mother, Margaret Garrett; to his sisters, Jane Brelsford and her
 husband, Harry, and Gina Werden and her husband, Jim; to Katrina
 Kelly; and to his many other friends and relatives; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jimmie
 Eugene Garrett Jr.
 Herrero
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2543 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 21, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House