House | 03/03/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 01/30/2015 | Filed |