Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2830 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2830


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Theron
 H. Wilson of Stephenville, who passed away on May 3, 2015, at the
 age of 91; and
 WHEREAS, Theron Wilson was born in Comanche to Clifford and
 Herma Wilson on April 21, 1924, and went on to spend most of his life
 in Erath County; coming of age during World War II, this courageous
 Texan served in that conflict as a member of the United States Army;
 he later enjoyed a successful career as a telephone installer; and
 WHEREAS, On December 25, 1949, Mr. Wilson married the love of
 his life, the former Mary Kathryn Underhill, and the couple became
 the proud parents of a daughter, Cathy Echols; as the years passed,
 their family grew to include two grandchildren, Michael and
 Jennifer, and two great-granddaughters, Audrey and Emily;
 sustained by a deep and abiding faith, Mr. Theron was a valued
 congregant at Assembly of God Church; and
 WHEREAS, Although Theron Wilson is deeply missed, cherished
 memories of time spent in his company will long endure in the hearts
 of his loved ones; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Theron H. Wilson and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife,
 Mary Wilson; to his daughter, Cathy Echols; to his grandson,
 Michael Wilson Echols, and his wife, Alecia; to his granddaughter,
 Jennifer Lynn Lesley, and her husband, Brian; to his
 great-granddaughters, Audrey Lynn Echols and Emily Lynn Lesley; and
 to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Theron H.
 Wilson.
 Sheffield
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2830 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 21, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House