2 | 3 | | |
---|
3 | 4 | | |
---|
4 | 5 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 6 | | WHEREAS, Since June 2013, the State of Texas has lost a number |
---|
6 | 7 | | of accomplished Texans, whose legacies live on through the loved |
---|
7 | 8 | | ones and achievements they leave behind; and |
---|
8 | 9 | | WHEREAS, Gone but forever remembered by those who knew them |
---|
9 | 10 | | as devoted husbands, wives, fathers, mothers, grandparents, |
---|
10 | 11 | | mentors, role models, public servants, and friends are the |
---|
11 | 12 | | following individuals: |
---|
12 | 13 | | Pearlie Tyrone, who passed away on May 14, 2015; |
---|
13 | 14 | | Colleen "Connie" Hegar, who passed away on April 27, 2015; |
---|
14 | 15 | | Christine "Chris" Bobadilla, who passed away on March 15, |
---|
15 | 16 | | 2015; |
---|
16 | 17 | | Eusebio Trujillo, who passed away on March 2, 2015; |
---|
17 | 18 | | Sandra Anderson, who passed away on March 7, 2015; |
---|
18 | 19 | | Thea Tue Torres and her son, Robert Hernandez Jr., who both |
---|
19 | 20 | | passed away on February 26, 2015; |
---|
20 | 21 | | Juan Javier Alonzo, who passed away on February 26, 2015; |
---|
21 | 22 | | Alejandro Torres, who passed away on February 22, 2015; |
---|
22 | 23 | | Irene Moreno, who passed away on February 4, 2015; |
---|
23 | 24 | | Rosa Lombrana, who passed away on January 7, 2015; |
---|
24 | 25 | | Ruby Mae Turner, who passed away on December 21, 2014; |
---|
25 | 26 | | Richard Ramirez Jr., who passed away on December 5, 2014; |
---|
26 | 27 | | Delia Becerra, who passed away on December 9, 2014; |
---|
27 | 28 | | The Honorable Ray Farabee, former Texas state senator, who |
---|
28 | 29 | | passed away on November 20, 2014; |
---|
29 | 30 | | Jaqueline Frank-Geissler, who passed away on November 11, |
---|
30 | 31 | | 2014; |
---|
31 | 32 | | Charlene Mary Roy, who passed away on November 6, 2014; |
---|
32 | 33 | | Julia Bass, the longtime journal clerk of the Texas House, |
---|
33 | 34 | | who passed away on November 5, 2014; |
---|
34 | 35 | | Grace Theresa Sambrano, who passed away on October 27, 2014; |
---|
35 | 36 | | Pauline Gurwitz Kress, who passed away on October 14, 2014; |
---|
36 | 37 | | Jacob "Jake" Abel Alonzo, who passed away on August 28, 2014; |
---|
37 | 38 | | Bibiana Alonzo-Harvey, who passed away on August 26, 2014; |
---|
38 | 39 | | Jose Regalado Herrera, who passed away on August 19, 2014; |
---|
39 | 40 | | Shirley Rae Elkins, who passed away on August 3, 2014; |
---|
40 | 41 | | Senator Bob McFarland, who passed away on July 23, 2014; |
---|
41 | 42 | | Juan Antonio Zamora Lira, who passed away on July 21, 2014; |
---|
42 | 43 | | William "Bill" Callejo, who passed away on May 10, 2014; |
---|
43 | 44 | | Representative Phillip E. "Phil" Cates, who passed away on |
---|
44 | 45 | | July 13, 2014; |
---|
45 | 46 | | Javier Remijio Alonzo, who passed away on June 21, 2014; |
---|
46 | 47 | | James Raney, who passed away on June 21, 2014; |
---|
47 | 48 | | Grace Garcia, who passed away on June 2, 2014; |
---|
48 | 49 | | Irene Larson, who passed away on June 1, 2014; |
---|
49 | 50 | | Janie Saldivar Ayala, who passed away on May 30, 2014; |
---|
50 | 51 | | Martin Lombrana, who passed away on May 13, 2014; |
---|
51 | 52 | | Stockton Frederick Briggle, who passed away on March 22, |
---|
52 | 53 | | 2014; |
---|
53 | 54 | | Henry Kuempel, who passed away on April 27, 2014; |
---|
54 | 55 | | Reverend Brigido Vera, who passed away on April 14, 2014; |
---|
55 | 56 | | Armando "Mando" Gonzalez, who passed away on April 9, 2014; |
---|
56 | 57 | | Antonio "Tony" Ayala Sr., who passed away on April 10, 2014; |
---|
57 | 58 | | Francisco Javier Escobar, who passed away in April 2014; |
---|
58 | 59 | | Louis J. Zapata Sr., who passed away on April 4, 2014; |
---|
59 | 60 | | Ismael Rivera Jr., who passed away on March 29, 2014; |
---|
60 | 61 | | Henry "Hank" Field Slagle, who passed away on March 27, 2014; |
---|
61 | 62 | | Jill Diana Currie Trantham, who passed away on March 17, |
---|
62 | 63 | | 2014; |
---|
63 | 64 | | Josue Maldonado, who passed away on March 16, 2014; |
---|
64 | 65 | | Benilde "Bennie" Mendoza Garza, who passed away on March 9, |
---|
65 | 66 | | 2014; |
---|
66 | 67 | | Jesus Gomez, who passed away on February 28, 2014; |
---|
67 | 68 | | Nellie Gonzales, who passed away on February 23, 2014; |
---|
68 | 69 | | Carl B. Hilderbran Sr., who passed away on February 17, 2014; |
---|
69 | 70 | | Willie Beatrice Clark Workman, who passed away on February 7, |
---|
70 | 71 | | 2014; |
---|
71 | 72 | | Manuela Ochoa, who passed away on January 29, 2014; |
---|
72 | 73 | | Adelfa Botello Callejo, who passed away on January 24, 2014; |
---|
73 | 74 | | Jose Sulaimán Chagnón, who passed away on January 16, 2014; |
---|
74 | 75 | | Richard Hinojosa, who passed away on January 19, 2014; |
---|
75 | 76 | | Aurelio Melendez, who passed away on January 14, 2014; |
---|
76 | 77 | | Luis Miguel Gonzalez del Toro, who passed away on October 15, |
---|
77 | 78 | | 2013; |
---|
78 | 79 | | Jose Lombrana, who passed away on December 23, 2013; |
---|
79 | 80 | | Jesse P. Leal, who passed away on December 23, 2013; |
---|
80 | 81 | | Donald Joseph Jones, who passed away on December 11, 2013; |
---|
81 | 82 | | Dr. Charles Branch, who passed away on December 6, 2013; |
---|
82 | 83 | | Arthur Antonio Garcia, who passed away on November 27, 2013; |
---|
83 | 84 | | Sam Maldonado, who passed away on November 21, 2013; |
---|
84 | 85 | | The Honorable Ben Miranda, former Arizona state |
---|
85 | 86 | | representative, who passed away on November 15, 2013; |
---|
86 | 87 | | Aurora M. Villa, who passed away on November 21, 2013; |
---|
87 | 88 | | Tommy Townsend, who passed away on November 18, 2013; |
---|
88 | 89 | | Regina Romero and her daughters, Araceli and Judith, who |
---|
89 | 90 | | passed away on November 18, 2013; |
---|
90 | 91 | | Sam Z. Coronado, who passed away on November 15, 2013; |
---|
91 | 92 | | Lillian Escobedo, who passed away on November 11, 2013; |
---|
92 | 93 | | Carlos Aguilar, who passed away on November 9, 2013; |
---|
93 | 94 | | Leonel Castillo, who passed away on November 4, 2013; |
---|
94 | 95 | | Amalia Ortiz, who passed away on October 25, 2013; |
---|
95 | 96 | | Paulette King, who passed away on September 12, 2013; |
---|
96 | 97 | | Jerry Russell, who passed away on September 5, 2013; |
---|
97 | 98 | | The Honorable William Forrest "Bill" Thorn, Grand Prairie |
---|
98 | 99 | | City Council member, who passed away on August 24, 2013; |
---|
99 | 100 | | Buhl Newman, who passed away on August 23, 2013; |
---|
100 | 101 | | Cindy Hughes Zerwas, who passed away on August 20, 2013; |
---|
101 | 102 | | Catarina Silva, who passed away on August 12, 2013; |
---|
102 | 103 | | Feliciano Torres, who passed away on August 17, 2013; |
---|
103 | 104 | | The Honorable Leo V. Chaney Jr., former Dallas City Council |
---|
104 | 105 | | member, who passed away on August 12, 2013; |
---|
105 | 106 | | The Honorable Ruthe Jackson, Grand Prairie City Council |
---|
106 | 107 | | member, who passed away on August 9, 2013; |
---|
107 | 108 | | Linda Kacal, who passed away on July 31, 2013; |
---|
108 | 109 | | Dr. Tony Wayne Smith, who passed away on July 27, 2013; |
---|
109 | 110 | | Ralph Diaz Sr., who passed away on July 15, 2013; |
---|
110 | 111 | | Frank Cantu, who passed away on July 16, 2013; |
---|
111 | 112 | | Carol Whitman, who passed away on July 15, 2013; |
---|
112 | 113 | | George A. Riddle Jr., who passed away on July 2, 2013; |
---|
113 | 114 | | Margarito "Mickey" Chavez, who passed away on June 27, 2013; |
---|
114 | 115 | | Daniel San Miguel Jr., who passed away on June 21, 2013; |
---|
115 | 116 | | Preston Geren, who passed away on June 11, 2013; and |
---|
116 | 117 | | Armandina "Mandy" Pesina, who passed away on June 3, 2013; |
---|
117 | 118 | | and |
---|
118 | 119 | | WHEREAS, Today, as we pause in remembrance of these esteemed |
---|
119 | 120 | | men and women, we acknowledge the positive difference they made in |
---|
120 | 121 | | the world during their years on this earth, and we honor their |
---|
121 | 122 | | memories for the many ways they enhanced the communities in which |
---|
122 | 123 | | they lived and worked; now, therefore, be it |
---|
123 | 124 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas |
---|
124 | 125 | | Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of the heretofore |
---|
125 | 126 | | mentioned Texans and extend deepest sympathy to all those who mourn |
---|
126 | 127 | | their passing. |
---|