House | 03/17/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 555 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 555 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 414 | |
House | 02/10/2015 | Filed |