House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Filed |