House | 03/23/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 572 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Filed |