House | 04/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | RV#181 | Journal Page: 1449 |
House | 04/09/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1449 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1445 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1052 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed |