E
|
06/15/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5559
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1733
|
Journal Page: 5558
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5558
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4478
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1437
|
Journal Page: 4477
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4477
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4477
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/25/15 11:25 AM
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4474
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4432
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1421
|
Journal Page: 4431
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4431
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
10-Meyer, Villalba, Hughes, Rinaldi, Capriglione, Anchia, and S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4428
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
9-K. King
|
Journal Page: 4426
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
7-Darby
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 4420
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4420
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4178
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1325
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 583
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 583
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 583
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 583
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 279
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 279
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|