House | 05/27/2015 | Point of order sustained | Rule 8, Section 13(c) | Journal Page: 4755 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4755 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Postponed | 5/26/15 10:00 PM | Journal Page: 4701 |
House | 05/26/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4701 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Postponed | 5/26/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 4515 |
House | 05/25/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4515 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Estes | Journal Page: 755 |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 702 |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 702 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 702 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 706 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |