Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1017 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hancock S.B. No. 1017
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2015; March 11, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the decertification of a certified capital company.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 228.302, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 the comptroller may decertify a certified capital company if the
 comptroller receives a request in writing from the certified
 capital company stating that the certified capital company has made
 qualified investments in an amount cumulatively equal to 100
 percent of the company's certified capital.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *