Senate | 05/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |