Senate | 05/18/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1437 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 380 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 380 | |
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |