E | 06/20/2015 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3648 | |
E | 05/27/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2660 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4756 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2087 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4481 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Record vote | RV#1440 | Journal Page: 4481 |
House | 05/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4481 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4481 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Postponed | 5/25/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 4357 |
House | 05/24/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4357 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4280 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#1362 | Journal Page: 4280 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4280 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4280 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3909 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1940 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1940 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1844 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Huffines | Journal Page: 1023 |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 380 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 380 | |
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |