E
|
06/04/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/04/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4684
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1519
|
Journal Page: 4683
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4683
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4683
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4533
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4533
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4533
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/25/15 2:55 PM
|
Journal Page: 4531
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4530
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 1274
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1274
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1274
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 382
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 382
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|