E | 06/16/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/16/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1970 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#1293 | Journal Page: 4114 |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4114 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4114 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4092 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4092 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2832 | Journal Page: 4092 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 716 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 672 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 382 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 382 | |
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |