House | 05/26/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 973 |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 973 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 972 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |