E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3695
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1173
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2969
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|