Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1058 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1058
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2015; March 16, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 7, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3;
 May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of criminal history record information of
 educators and other public school employees who engage in certain
 misconduct.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 21.006(b), (b-1), (c), and (d),
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  In addition to the reporting requirement under Section
 261.101, Family Code, the superintendent or director of a school
 district, open-enrollment charter school, regional education
 service center, or shared services arrangement shall notify the
 State Board for Educator Certification if [the superintendent or
 director has reasonable cause to believe that]:
 (1)  an educator employed by or seeking employment by
 the district, school, service center, or shared services
 arrangement has a criminal record and the district, school, service
 center, or shared services arrangement obtained information about
 the educator's criminal record by a means other than the criminal
 history clearinghouse established under Section 411.0845,
 Government Code;
 (2)  an educator's employment at the district, school,
 service center, or shared services arrangement was terminated based
 on evidence [a determination] that the educator:
 (A)  abused or otherwise committed an unlawful act
 with a student or minor;
 (A-1)  was involved in a romantic relationship
 with or solicited or engaged in sexual contact with a student or
 minor;
 (B)  possessed, transferred, sold, or distributed
 a controlled substance, as defined by Chapter 481, Health and
 Safety Code, or by 21 U.S.C. Section 801 et seq.[, and its
 subsequent amendments];
 (C)  illegally transferred, appropriated, or
 expended funds or other property of the district, school, service
 center, or shared services arrangement;
 (D)  attempted by fraudulent or unauthorized
 means to obtain or alter a professional certificate or license for
 the purpose of promotion or additional compensation; or
 (E)  committed a criminal offense or any part of a
 criminal offense on school property or at a school-sponsored event;
 (3)  the educator resigned and there is [reasonable]
 evidence [supports a recommendation by the superintendent or
 director to terminate the educator based on a determination] that
 the educator engaged in misconduct described by Subdivision (2); or
 (4)  the educator engaged in conduct that violated the
 assessment instrument security procedures established under
 Section 39.0301.
 (b-1)  A superintendent or director of a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school shall complete an investigation of
 an educator that is based on evidence that [reasonable cause to
 believe] the educator may have engaged in misconduct described by
 Subsection (b)(2)(A) or (A-1), despite the educator's resignation
 from district or school employment before completion of the
 investigation.
 (c)  The superintendent or director must notify the State
 Board for Educator Certification by filing a report with the board
 not later than the seventh day after the date the superintendent or
 director knew or should have known [first learns] about an
 employee's criminal record under Subsection (b)(1) or a termination
 of employment or resignation following an alleged incident of
 misconduct described by Subsection (b).  The report must be:
 (1)  in writing; and
 (2)  in a form prescribed by the board.
 (d)  The superintendent or director shall notify the board of
 trustees or governing body of the school district, open-enrollment
 charter school, regional education service center, or shared
 services arrangement and the educator of the filing of the report
 required by Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 22.087, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 22.087.  NOTIFICATION TO STATE BOARD FOR EDUCATOR
 CERTIFICATION. The superintendent of a school district or the
 director of an open-enrollment charter school, private school,
 regional education service center, or shared services arrangement
 shall promptly notify the State Board for Educator Certification in
 writing if:
 (1)  the person obtains or has knowledge of information
 showing that an applicant for or holder of a certificate issued
 under Subchapter B, Chapter 21, has a reported criminal history;
 and
 (2)  the person obtained the information by a means
 other than the criminal history clearinghouse established under
 Section 411.0845, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *