E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5755
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1775
|
Journal Page: 5754
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5754
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6022
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3497
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3497
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5520
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2830
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2830
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2830
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2830
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2830
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4359
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1393
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4284
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amended
|
1-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4284
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4284
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|