House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3896
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2832
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 415
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 415
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|