E | 06/09/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/09/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3645 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4467 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1898 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4140 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#1310 | Journal Page: 4139 |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4139 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4139 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3974 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3974 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3845 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3226 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1209 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |