E
|
05/22/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
E
|
05/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1547
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1537
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1547
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1470
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2818
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2818
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 843
|
Journal Page: 2818
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2003
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2003
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 418
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 418
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|