Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1119 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R1178 EES-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1119


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot project to evaluate the use of telepractice to
 provide certain services to children and adults with an autism
 spectrum disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02177 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02177.  AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDER TELEPRACTICE
 PILOT PROJECT. (a) In this section, "telepractice" means the use
 of telecommunications technology to facilitate a diagnosis or
 intervention.
 (b)  The commission shall develop and implement a six-year
 pilot project in which evidence-based diagnostic and intervention
 services are provided to children and adults with an autism
 spectrum disorder by telepractice by certain physicians and health
 and other professionals.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
 to develop and implement the pilot project under this section. The
 rules adopted under this section:
 (1)  must allow a service provider to be physically
 located at and provide services from any site located in or
 associated with the autism centers at the following institutions:
 (A)  The University of Texas Health Science Center
 at Houston;
 (B)  Baylor College of Medicine;
 (C)  the University of Houston--Clear Lake;
 (D)  The University of Texas at Dallas and The
 University of Texas Southwestern Medical Center;
 (E)  the University of North Texas;
 (F)  Texas A&M University;
 (G)  The University of Texas at Austin;
 (H)  Texas State University; and
 (I)  Texas Tech University;
 (2)  must require services to be provided by a person
 authorized to provide telemedicine medical services or telehealth
 services or by any of the following persons employed by or under
 contract with one of the autism centers described in Subdivision
 (1):
 (A)  a board certified behavior analyst;
 (B)  an occupational therapist;
 (C)  a speech-language therapist; or
 (D)  a physical therapist;
 (3)  must require that the scope of services that may be
 provided by telepractice includes those services that may be
 provided through telemedicine medical services and telehealth
 services and intensive behavioral intervention, applied behavioral
 analysis, and speech-language evaluation and treatment;
 (4)  may not require a participant in the pilot project
 to submit to an in-person evaluation by a service provider before
 the participant receives services by telepractice from the
 provider;
 (5)  may not require a person to reside in a rural area
 or a medically underserved area as a condition of participating in
 the pilot project;
 (6)  must require a participant to be physically
 located at and receive services at a site at which a person may
 receive telemedicine medical services or telehealth services or any
 of the following sites:
 (A)  a primary or secondary school;
 (B)  an alternative education center;
 (C)  an education service center;
 (D)  a licensed child-care facility;
 (E)  a site where Head Start or Early Head Start
 program services are provided;
 (F)  a site where early childhood intervention
 services are provided; or
 (G)  the participant's home;
 (7)  must allow the following persons to be present at a
 site where a participant receives services, to introduce the
 participant to the service provider, and to perform any tasks
 delegated by the service provider:
 (A)  a person authorized to be a site presenter at
 a site where a person is receiving telemedicine medical services or
 telehealth services;
 (B)  a certified elementary or secondary school
 teacher;
 (C)  a licensed early childhood education and care
 professional;
 (D)  a licensed specialist in school psychology;
 (E)  a certified educational diagnostician;
 (F)  an early childhood intervention services
 provider who is not credentialed to provide qualified mental health
 professional community services;
 (G)  a registered or licensed vocational nurse who
 is not credentialed to provide qualified mental health professional
 community services;
 (H)  a board certified behavior analyst;
 (I)  a speech-language therapist;
 (J)  an occupational therapist;
 (K)  a physical therapist;
 (L)  a person who conducts home visits under the
 Maternal, Infant, and Early Childhood Home Visiting Program; or
 (M)  a promotora, as defined by Section 48.001,
 Health and Safety Code;
 (8)  must require that a service provider maintain all
 records relating to the service provider's telepractice
 interaction with a participant and provide copies of those records
 to the participant; and
 (9)  may not require a person present at a site where a
 participant is receiving services to maintain records relating to a
 service provider's telepractice interaction with the participant
 that are created at the site where the service provider is located.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the commission shall
 submit a report to the legislature evaluating the pilot project.
 The report required by this subsection may be submitted
 electronically.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2015, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 531.02177, Government Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall ensure that the pilot project
 required by Section 531.02177, Government Code, as added by this
 Act, is in operation.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.