Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill November 10, 2014

House Committee Report

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 1, 2025
Bill May 13, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015