Senate | 04/22/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |