E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1538
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#964
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
1-S. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2906
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1845
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|