Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1128 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/18/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1128


 AN ACT
 relating to certain diagnostic testing during pregnancy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 81.090, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a-1), (c), (c-1), and (c-2) and
 adding Subsection (p) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A physician or other person permitted by law to attend
 a pregnant woman during gestation or at delivery of an infant shall:
 (1)  take or cause to be taken a sample of the woman's
 blood or other appropriate specimen at an examination in the third
 trimester of the pregnancy, but not earlier than the 28th week of
 the pregnancy;
 (2)  submit the sample to an appropriately certified
 laboratory for a diagnostic test approved by the United States Food
 and Drug Administration for syphilis and HIV infection; and
 (3)  retain a report of each case for nine months and
 deliver the report to any successor in the case.
 (c)  A physician or other person in attendance at a delivery
 shall:
 (1)  take or cause to be taken a sample of blood or
 other appropriate specimen from the mother on admission for
 delivery; and
 (2)  submit the sample to an appropriately certified
 laboratory for diagnostic testing approved by the United States
 Food and Drug Administration for[:
 [(A)  syphilis; and
 [(B)]  hepatitis B infection.
 (c-1)  If the physician or other person in attendance at the
 delivery does not find in the woman's medical records results from
 the diagnostic test for syphilis and HIV infection performed under
 Subsection (a-1), the physician or person shall:
 (1)  take or cause to be taken a sample of blood or
 other appropriate specimen from the mother;
 (2)  submit the sample to an appropriately certified
 laboratory for diagnostic testing approved by the United States
 Food and Drug Administration for syphilis and HIV infection; and
 (3)  instruct the laboratory to expedite the processing
 of the HIV test so that the results are received less than six hours
 after the time the sample is submitted.
 (c-2)  If the physician or other person responsible for the
 newborn child [in attendance at the delivery] does not find in the
 woman's medical records results from a diagnostic test for syphilis
 and HIV infection performed under Subsection (a-1), and the
 diagnostic test for syphilis and HIV infection was not performed
 before delivery under Subsection (c-1), the physician or other
 person responsible for the newborn child [in attendance at
 delivery] shall:
 (1)  take or cause to be taken a sample of blood or
 other appropriate specimen from the newborn child less than two
 hours after the time of birth;
 (2)  submit the sample to an appropriately certified
 laboratory for a diagnostic test approved by the United States Food
 and Drug Administration for syphilis and HIV infection; and
 (3)  instruct the laboratory to expedite the processing
 of the HIV test so that the results are received less than six hours
 after the time the sample is submitted.
 (p)  Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the
 department shall report to the legislature the number of cases of
 early congenital syphilis and of late congenital syphilis that were
 diagnosed in this state in the preceding biennium.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 81.090(a-1), (c), (c-1), and (c-2),
 Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to
 submission of a sample for diagnostic testing on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  The submission of a sample for
 diagnostic testing before the effective date of this Act is covered
 by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this
 Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1128 passed the Senate on
 April 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 18, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1128 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 12, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 4, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor